Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000106106 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP20861699 | 23.07.1999 | JP21542598 | 30.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0977239 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2002 | A3 | EP0977239 | 02.02.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP21542598 | 30.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1244026 | 09.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21542598 | 30.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100321818B | 02.02.2002 | B1 | KR20000012054 | 25.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21542598 | 30.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW468194B | 11.12.2001 | B | Priority number | Date | JP21542598 | 30.07.1998 |