EP0977239 - Deflection yoke, cathode ray tube apparatus using thereof and display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Hitachi Media Electronics Co., Ltd. 1, Kitano Aza, Shinjo Mizusawa-shi Iwate-ken 023-0841 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Hitachi Media Electronics Co., Ltd. 1, Kitano, Aza, Shinjo Mizusawa-shi, Iwate-ken 023-0841 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuma, Kouji No. 102 Shinwa-ryo, 1 Kitano, Aza, Shinjo Mizusawa-shi, Iwate-ken 023-0841 / JP | 02 /
Okuyama, Nobutaka 5-36-9-602 Hirado, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 244-0802 / JP | 03 /
Sakurai, Soichi 5-801 Doriimu-haitsu, 1403 Matano-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 245-0066 / JP | 04 /
Ikeda, Misao 3-11-8 Toubudai Mobara-shi, Chiba-ken 297-0015 / JP | 05 /
Sasaki, Tomohiko 1-2-37 Higashinakadori Mizusawa-shi, Iwate-ken 023-0822 / JP | 06 /
Yukimatsu, Takanori No. 105 Shinwa-ryo, 1 Kitano, Aza, Shinjo Mizusawa-shi, Iwate-ken 023-0841 / JP | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99305892.4 | 26.07.1999 | [2000/05] | Priority number, date | JP19980215425 | 30.07.1998 Original published format: JP 21542598 | [2000/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0977239 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0977239 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/76 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
H01J29/76 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/03] |
Former [2000/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ablenkjoch, dieses Ablenkjoch verwendende Kathodenstrahlröhre und Anzeigevorrichtung | [2000/05] | English: | Deflection yoke, cathode ray tube apparatus using thereof and display device | [2000/05] | French: | Bobine de déviation, tube à rayons cathodiques l'utilisant et dispositif d'affichage | [2000/05] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 01.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/32] | 09.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]WO9905693 (THOMSON TUBES & DISPLAYS [FR], et al) [PA] 1,18,34 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP0851456 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1-4 * |