EP0976962 - Multi-line fluid connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WEC Co. 15 Old Boston Turnpike Hubbardston Massachusetts 01452 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states WEC Co. 15 Old Boston Turnpike Hubbardston, Massachusetts 01452 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horton, Lee A. 72 Heather Circle Jefferson, Massachusetts 01522 / US | 02 /
Erickson, Arthur A. 51 Pitcherville Road Hubbardston, Massachusetts 01452 / US | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99305957.5 | 27.07.1999 | [2000/05] | Priority number, date | US19980124637 | 29.07.1998 Original published format: US 124637 | [2000/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0976962 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0976962 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16L39/00, F16L29/04, E02F3/36 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
E02F3/3627 (EP,US);
E02F3/3654 (EP,US);
E02F3/3663 (EP,US);
F16L29/04 (EP,US);
F16L39/005 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87925 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87949 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/05] | F16L39/00, F16L29/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/05] | Title | German: | Anschlussteil für mehrere Leitungen | [2000/05] | English: | Multi-line fluid connector | [2000/05] | French: | Connecteur à conduits multiples | [2000/05] | Examination procedure | 05.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 03.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/39] | 23.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5014743 (MAKISHIMA REICHI [JP]) [X] 1-5,13,36-40 * figure - * [A] 6-12,16-20,26-30,33; | [XA]DE4027414 (KOMOTZKI) [X] 1,2,4,5,13 * figure - * [A] 6-12,36-40; | [A]DE19706998 (EKMAN THURE [SE]) [A] 1,16-18,23,26-29,36 * abstract *; | [A]JPH05311689 (IIDA TEKKO KK) [A] 16,17,23-27,29 * figure - * | by applicant | US5727342 |