blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0976561

EP0976561 - Liquid discharge head, and liquid discharge apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/05]Liquid discharge head, liquid discharge method, and liquid discharge apparatus
[2006/34]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.03.2008
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 06.08.2008  [2008/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2007/20]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Taneya, Yoichi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Sugama, Sadayuki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Ishinaga, Hiroyuki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Sugiyama, Hiroyuki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
05 / Shimazu, Satoshi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
 [2007/19]
Former [2000/05]01 / Yoichi, Taneya, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Sadayuki, Sugama, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Hiroyuki, Ishinaga, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Hiroyuki, Sugiyama, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
05 / Satoshi, Shimazu, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al
Beresford & Co
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al
BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date99305987.228.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateJP1998021271828.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21271898
JP1998023611321.08.1998         Original published format: JP 23611398
JP1998023611421.08.1998         Original published format: JP 23611498
JP1998023611521.08.1998         Original published format: JP 23611598
JP1998023611621.08.1998         Original published format: JP 23611698
JP1998023611821.08.1998         Original published format: JP 23611898
JP1998023611921.08.1998         Original published format: JP 23611998
JP1998023612121.08.1998         Original published format: JP 23612198
JP1998023612621.08.1998         Original published format: JP 23612698
[2007/33]
Former [2000/14]JP1998021271828.07.1998
JP1998023611321.08.1998
JP1998023611421.08.1998
JP1998023611521.08.1998
JP1998032611629.10.1998
JP1998023611821.08.1998
JP1998023611921.08.1998
JP1998023612121.08.1998
JP1998023612621.08.1998
Former [2000/05]JP1998021271828.07.1998
JP1998023611321.08.1998
JP1998023611421.08.1998
JP1998023611521.08.1998
JP1998032611621.08.1998
JP1998023611821.08.1998
JP1998023611921.08.1998
JP1998023612121.08.1998
JP1998023612621.08.1998
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976561
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0976561
Date:06.09.2000
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976561
Date:16.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/20]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP0976561
Date:19.09.2007
[2007/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2000
ClassificationIPC:B41J2/14
[2000/05]
CPC:
B41J2/14129 (EP,US); B41J2/05 (KR); B41J2/14048 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/21]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Flüssigkeitsausstosskopf, und Flüssigkeitsausstossvorrichtung[2006/34]
English:Liquid discharge head, and liquid discharge apparatus[2006/34]
French:Tête pour l'éjection de liquide, et appareil d'éjection de liquide[2006/34]
Former [2000/05]Flüssigkeitsausstosskopf, Flüssigkeitsausstossverfahren und Flüssigkeitsausstossvorrichtung
Former [2000/05]Liquid discharge head, liquid discharge method, and liquid discharge apparatus
Former [2000/05]Tête pour l'éjection de liquide, procédé d'éjection de liquide et appareil d'éjection de liquide
Examination procedure23.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/12]
22.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.12.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
18.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2007Fee for grant paid
27.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.02.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/17]
Request for further processing for:17.02.2005Request for further processing filed
17.02.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.03.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT16.05.2007
NL16.05.2007
ES27.08.2007
FR11.01.2008
[2008/32]
Former [2008/23]IT16.05.2007
NL16.05.2007
ES27.08.2007
Former [2008/17]NL16.05.2007
ES27.08.2007
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0436047  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] * the whole document *;
 [DA]US5278585  (KARZ ROBERT S [US], et al) [DA] * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0721841  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,57 * page 11, line 1 - page 12, line 10 * * figures 10-12 *;
 [A]EP0745479  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] * page 10, line 35 - line 58 * * figure 14 *;
 [A]EP0816087  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] * figures 6,11,12 *;
 [A]EP0816088  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0819530  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] * column 20, line 31 - column 21, line 52 * * figure 8 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.