blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0977432

EP0977432 - Image pickup apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.08.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.09.2006  [2006/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Olympus Optical Co., Ltd.
43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Olympus Optical Co., Ltd.
43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kakinuma, Minoru, Intellec. Property & Legal Dept.
Olympus Optical Co., Ltd., 2-3, Kuboyama-cho
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP
02 / Fukuda, Hidetoshi Intellec.Property & Legal Dept.
Olympus Optical Co., Ltd., 2-3, Kuboyama-cho
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP
03 / Koseki, Hiroaki, Intellec. Property & Legal Dept.
Olympus Optical Co., Ltd., 2-3, Kuboyama-cho
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP
04 / Momose, Takumi, Intellec. Property & Legal Dept.
Olympus Optical Co., Ltd., 2-3, Kuboyama-cho
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP
05 / Inagaki, Osamu, Intellec. Property & Legal Dept.
Olympus Optical Co., Ltd., 2-3, Kuboyama-cho
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP
[2000/05]
Representative(s)WP Thompson
8th Floor
1 Mann Island
Liverpool L3 1BP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]W.P. Thompson & Co.
Coopers Building, Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date99305995.528.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateJP1998022657528.07.1998         Original published format: JP 22657598
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0977432
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0977432
Date:06.07.2005
[2005/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.02.2004
ClassificationIPC:H04N5/235
[2000/05]
CPC:
H04N5/144 (EP,US); H04N23/70 (EP,US); H04N23/741 (EP,US)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2006/13]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bildaufnahmevorrichtung[2000/05]
English:Image pickup apparatus[2000/05]
French:Dispositif de prise de vues[2000/05]
Examination procedure10.01.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/38]
03.05.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2006/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.02.2006AT   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2006BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2006CH   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2006CY   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2006DE   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2006DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2006ES   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2006FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2006FR   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2006GB   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2006GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2006IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2006IT   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2006LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2006MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2006NL   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2006PT   M01   Not yet paid
14.02.2006SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
14.02.2006M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[PX]JPH10243288  ;
 [X]JPH09312799  ;
 [A]JPH07135599  ;
 [A]JPH0965269  ;
 [XA]US5309243  (TSAI YUSHENG T [US]);
 [X]EP0725536  (CANON KK [JP]);
 [PA]US5801773  (IKEDA EIICHIRO [JP]);
 [L]US6278490  (FUKUDA HIDETOSHI [JP], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.