blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0981164

EP0981164 - Low resistance fill for deep trench capacitor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.01.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.02.2007  [2007/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bronner, Gary B., c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd.
Intel. Prop. Law, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
02 / Gambino, Jeffrey P., c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd.
Intel. Prop. Law, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
03 / Mandelman, Jack A., c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd.
Intel. Prop. Law, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
04 / Mohler, Rick L., c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd.
Intel. Prop. Law, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
05 / Radens, Carl, c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd.
Intel. Prop. Law, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
06 / Tonti, William R., c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd.
Intel. Prop. Law, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Ling, Christopher John
IBM United Kingdom Limited
Intellectual Property Department
Hursley Park
Winchester
Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Ling, Christopher John
IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date99306024.329.07.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateUS1998013574418.08.1998         Original published format: US 135744
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0981164
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0981164
Date:15.10.2003
[2003/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.09.2003
ClassificationIPC:H01L27/108, H01L21/8242
[2000/08]
CPC:
H10D1/047 (EP,US); H10B12/038 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/08]
TitleGerman:Füllung mit niedrigem Widerstand für Kondensator in tiefem Graben[2000/08]
English:Low resistance fill for deep trench capacitor[2000/08]
French:Remplissage à faible resistance pour condensateur à sillon profond[2000/08]
Examination procedure14.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/03]
06.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/06]
20.09.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
15.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
18.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
21.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH1027885  ;
 [A]EP0621632  (IBM [US]);
 [A]US5563433  (NAGATA TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al);
 [A]US5696017  (UENO KAZUYOSHI [JP]);
 [PX]US5905279  (NITAYAMA AKIHIRO [JP], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.