EP0978753 - Reflection type liquid crystal display element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sekime, Tomoaki 1-106,122, Onaku 3-chome Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa 921-8147 / JP | 02 /
Yamaguchi, Hisanori 202,4-12-4, Honmachi, Nonoichi-cho Ishikawa-gun, Ishikawa 921-8815 / JP | 03 /
Iwai, Yoshio 1-5-1-211, Arimatsu Kanazawa, Ishikawa 921-8161 / JP | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Butcher, Ian James, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Butcher, Ian James, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 99306044.1 | 29.07.1999 | [2000/06] | Priority number, date | JP19980224632 | 07.08.1998 Original published format: JP 22463298 | [2000/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0978753 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0978753 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1335, G02F1/139, G02F1/13363 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
G02F1/1396 (EP,US);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
G02F1/133634 (EP,US);
G02F1/133504 (EP,US);
G02F2203/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/06] | G02F1/1335, G02F1/139 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/36] |
Former [2000/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeigeelement vom Reflexionstyp | [2000/06] | English: | Reflection type liquid crystal display element | [2000/06] | French: | Elément d'affichage réflectif à cristal liquide | [2000/06] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 15.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/04] | 30.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0162775 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [A] 4,5,11 * page 14 - page 15; figure 8 *; | [YA]EP0470817 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-3,7,9,10 * column 7, line 47 - column 9, line 10; figures 13-15 * [A] 6,15-23; | [A]EP0576303 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-7,9-11,15-18 * column 11, line 14 - column 12, line 26 * * column 13, line 31 - column 15, line 33; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]US5519523 (MADOKORO HITOMI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,7,9,10 * column 2, line 21 - column 4, line 40 * * column 5, line 9 - column 5, line 42 *; | [E]GB2335755 (SHARP KK [JP]) [E] 1-3,9,10,21,22* the whole document *; | [A] - KUO C -L ET AL, "WIDE-VIEWING-ANGLE REFLECTIVE LCD USING A FILM-COMPENSATED HAN CELL WITH SINGLE POLARIZER", ASIA DISPLAY,XX,XX, (19951016), pages 135 - 138, XP002073481 [A] 1-3,7,8,11,15 * page 135, column R - page 136; figures 1,2; tables 1,2 * |