EP0982497 - Compressor capacity modulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COPELAND CORPORATION 1675 W Campbell Road Sidney Ohio 45365-0669 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states COPELAND CORPORATION 1675 W Campbell Road Sidney Ohio 45365-0669 / US | ||
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states COPELAND CORPORATION 1675 W Campbell Road Sidney Ohio 45365-0669 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caillat, Jean-Luc 7001 Settlement Way Dayton, Ohio 45414 / US | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 99306052.4 | 29.07.1999 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | US19980139865 | 25.08.1998 Original published format: US 139865 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0982497 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0982497 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F04B49/06, F04C29/10 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
F04C28/24 (EP,US);
F25B49/00 (KR);
A47F3/04 (EP,US);
F04B49/06 (EP,US);
F04B49/22 (EP,US);
F04B49/225 (EP,US);
F04C18/0215 (EP,US);
F04C27/005 (EP,US);
F04C28/00 (EP,US);
F04C28/02 (EP,US);
F04C28/06 (EP,US);
F04C28/08 (EP,US);
F04C28/22 (EP,US);
F04C28/265 (EP,US);
F04C28/28 (EP,US);
F25B1/04 (EP,US);
F25B41/22 (EP,KR,US);
F25B41/35 (EP,US);
F25B49/005 (EP,US);
F25B49/022 (EP,US);
F25B5/02 (EP,US);
G05D23/1909 (EP,US);
F04B2201/0601 (EP,US);
F04B2205/16 (EP,US);
F04B2207/043 (EP,US);
F04C2270/015 (EP,US);
F04C2270/58 (EP,US);
F04C2270/86 (EP,US);
F04C23/008 (EP,US);
F25B2400/22 (EP,US);
F25B2600/0261 (EP,US);
F25B2600/2521 (EP,US);
F25B2700/193 (EP,US);
F25B2700/1933 (EP,US);
F25B2700/2106 (EP,US);
F25B2700/2117 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/46] |
Former [2000/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Liefermengenregelung eines Verdichters | [2000/09] | English: | Compressor capacity modulation | [2000/09] | French: | Compresseur avec modulation de capacité | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 16.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04028437.4 / EP1515047 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08284842 ; | [X]JPS59145392 ; | [XY]DE764179 (KLEIN) [X] 1-8,10,11,26 * page 3, line 105 - page 5, line 72; figure 1 * * page 6, line 93 - page 7, line 24; figure 3 * [Y] 9,12,13,17-22,24; | [X]US3653783 (SAUDER EARL R) [X] 1-8,10,11,14-16,26 * column 1, line 6 - line 53 ** column 1, line 65 - column 4, line 9; figure - *; | [Y]GB2116635 (TRANE CO) [Y] 17-22,24,25 * page 1, line 5 - line 8 * * page 1, line 56 - line 79 * * page 2, line 91 - page 3, line 94; figures 1-3 * * page 4, line 42 - line 92; figure 8 *; | [Y]DE3422398 (KNORR BREMSE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 12,13,25 * page 13, line 11 - page 22, line 21; figures 1,3 *; | [Y]US4715792 (NISHIZAWA KAZUTOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 9 * column 3, line 28 - line 68; figures 1,2 * * column 4, line 54 - line 66 * * column 5, line 37 - line 54; figure 9 * * column 7, line 8 - line 15 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 2, & JP08284842 A 19961029 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841214), vol. 8, no. 274, Database accession no. (M - 345)<1711>, & JP59145392 A 00000000 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO) [X] 1,11,12 * abstract * |