blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0978755

EP0978755 - Auxiliary drive system for power-driven apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.09.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip29.09.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.11.2006  [2006/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210, Nakanuma
Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/47]For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi
Kanagawa / JP
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210,Nakanuma, Minami-ashigara-shi
Kanagawa / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nishinou, Naoyuki
Fuji Photo Film, Co., Ltd., 3-13-45, Senzui
Asaki-shi, Saitama / JP
02 / Sugano, Yoshio
Fuji Photo Film, Co., Ltd., 3-13-45, Senzui
Asaki-shi, Saitama / JP
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Stevens, Jason Paul
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Stevens, Jason Paul
Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date99306141.503.08.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateJP1998021905703.08.1998         Original published format: JP 21905798
JP1998025492909.09.1998         Original published format: JP 25492998
JP1999020599921.07.1999         Original published format: JP 20599999
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978755
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978755
Date:23.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:G03B17/42
[2000/06]
CPC:
G03B17/425 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/43]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Hilfsantriebssystem für automatisches Gerät[2000/06]
English:Auxiliary drive system for power-driven apparatus[2000/06]
French:Système d'entraînement auxiliaire pour un appareil automatique[2000/06]
Examination procedure07.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/40]
17.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.2005Fee for grant paid
14.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
25.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US5640625  (HOZUMI TOSHIAKI [JP]) [A] 1,2,9 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5414482  (IWAI FUMIO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,9 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US4400073  (TOSAKA YOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,9 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.