Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0978826
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
08.07.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] |
18.03.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
08.10.2004 |
First examination report |
|
01.10.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.08.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.08.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.08.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.01.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
14.09.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 31.10.2001 [2001/44] |
24.08.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] |
23.08.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.12.2000 |
Publication of search report |
published on 14.02.2001 [2001/07] |
29.12.2000 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.02.2001 [2001/07] |
23.12.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] |