Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000076676 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP24863498 | 02.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000057684 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP22145998 | 05.08.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0978826 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2001 | A3 | EP0978826 | 09.02.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP22145998 | 05.08.1998 | JP24863498 | 02.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6324134 | 27.11.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP22145998 | 05.08.1998 | JP24863498 | 02.09.1998 |