EP0985825 - Plunger pump for lubricants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lincoln Industrial Corporation One Lincoln Way St Louis Missouri 63120 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states Lincoln Industrial Corporation One Lincoln Way St Louis, Missouri 63120 / US | ||
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states McNeil (Ohio) Corporation One Lincoln Way St. Louis, Missouri 63120 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DiCarlo, Leonard J. One Lincoln Way St. Louis, Missouri 63120 / US | 02 /
Conley, Paul G. One Lincoln Way St. Louis, Missouri 63120 / US | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen W.P. Thompson & Co, 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2000/11] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99306232.2 | 05.08.1999 | [2000/11] | Priority number, date | US19980151526 | 11.09.1998 Original published format: US 151526 | [2000/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0985825 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0985825 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | [2000/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0985825 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F04B5/02, F04B19/02, F16N13/04 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
F04B5/02 (EP,US);
F04B19/022 (EP,US);
F04B23/023 (EP,US);
F04B53/126 (EP,US);
F04B9/045 (EP,US);
F16N13/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/11] | F04B53/12, F16N13/04, F04B9/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/11] | Title | German: | Kolbenpumpe für Schmiermittel | [2000/11] | English: | Plunger pump for lubricants | [2000/11] | French: | Pompe à piston pour lubrifiants | [2000/11] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 16.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.01.2005 | BE | 19.01.2005 | CH | 19.01.2005 | FI | 19.01.2005 | LI | 19.01.2005 | NL | 19.01.2005 | DK | 19.04.2005 | GR | 19.04.2005 | PT | 19.06.2005 | CY | 05.08.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/21] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
BE | 19.01.2005 | ||
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
NL | 19.01.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 19.04.2005 | ||
CY | 05.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
BE | 19.01.2005 | ||
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
NL | 19.01.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 19.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
BE | 19.01.2005 | ||
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 19.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
BE | 19.01.2005 | ||
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
BE | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 19.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2895421 (PEEPS DONALD J) [A] 1 * column 3, line 61 - column 7, line 9; figure 8 *; | [A]US3906845 (WEGMANN JEROME B) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2566052 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5655885 (CHUNG YANG WOONG [US]) [A] 1* column 2, line 66 - column 5, line 56; figure 1 * |