Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.10.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
30.09.2008 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
13.06.2008 | New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | |
13.06.2008 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | |
14.02.2008 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | |
28.08.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.02.2007 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
08.09.2006 | First examination report | |
02.09.2006 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
23.08.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.03.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 26.04.2006 [2006/17] |
30.09.2005 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |
25.08.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.06.2005 | Publication of search report | published on 03.08.2005 [2005/31] |
25.08.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.08.2003 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.08.2002 | Renewal fee | |
27.08.2001 | Renewal fee | |
14.01.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.03.2000 [2000/09] |