blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0993074

EP0993074 - Connector base for a coil device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.09.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city
Mie 510-8503 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-City, Mie, 510-8503 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Muta, Junji, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510-8503 / JP
02 / Ito, Katsuya, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510-8503 / JP
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Chettle, Adrian John, et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Chettle, Adrian John, et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date99306280.109.08.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateJP1998025997114.09.1998         Original published format: JP 25997198
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0993074
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0993074
Date:14.03.2001
[2001/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993074
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2001
ClassificationIPC:H01R4/10, H01H50/02, G11B33/12, H01R12/32, H02K5/04
[2001/11]
CPC:
H01R25/00 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/15]H01R4/10, H01H50/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/49]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verbinderbasis für Spulenvorrichtung[2000/15]
English:Connector base for a coil device[2000/15]
French:Embase de connecteur pour dispositif à bobinage[2000/15]
Examination procedure30.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
13.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2002Fee for grant paid
13.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR13.11.2002
IT13.11.2002
GB09.08.2003
[2008/17]
Former [2006/14]FR13.11.2002
GB09.08.2003
Former [2004/45]GB09.08.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]GB1459434  (SMITHS) [X] 1,2 * page 2, lines 100-113 *;
 [Y]US5659213  (IMASHIRO HIDEKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4,8-10 * figures 1,2,4 *;
 [Y]JPH08324286  ;
 [Y]DE19715511  (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [Y] 4 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 9; figure 3 *;
 [A]US4472693  (UEMURA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 6 * figures 1,5,6 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 1997, no. 04, & JP08324286 A 19961210 (AISIN AW CO LTD) [Y] 1-3,8-10 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.