blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0980129

EP0980129 - Current transformer saturation correction using artificial neural networks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.11.2009
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cooper Industries, LLC.
600 Travis, Suite 5800
Houston, TX 77002 / US
[2005/29]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
McGraw-Edison Company
600 Travis, Suite 5800
Houston, Texas 77002 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Cummins, James C.
5797 Rustic Lane
Greendale, Wisconsin 53129 / US
02 / Stone, David T.
2712 North Maryland Avenue
Milwaukee, Wisconsin 53211 / US
03 / Yu, David C.
148 West Boundary Road
Mequon, Wisconsin 53092 / US
04 / Kojovic, Ljubomir A.
2101 Circlewood Drive
Racine, Wisconsin 53402 / US
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Brunner, Michael John
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Brunner, Michael John
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99306284.309.08.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateUS19980096459P13.08.1998         Original published format: US 96459 P
US1999027538824.03.1999         Original published format: US 275388
[2000/11]
Former [2000/07]US1998009645913.08.1998
US1999027538824.03.1999
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0980129
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0980129
Date:17.01.2001
[2001/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.2000
ClassificationIPC:H02H7/04, H02H1/00
[2001/03]
CPC:
H02H1/0092 (EP,US); H02H7/04 (KR); H02H1/046 (EP,US);
H02H3/05 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/07]H02H7/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2001/41]
Former [2001/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  LI 
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Stromwandlersättigungskorrektur mit künstlichen neuronalen Netzwerken[2000/07]
English:Current transformer saturation correction using artificial neural networks[2000/07]
French:Correction de la saturation d'un transformateur de courant utilisant des résaux neuronaux artificiels[2000/07]
Examination procedure06.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/36]
18.07.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
08.11.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
08.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/51]
28.07.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2009/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
06.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
08.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
07.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
03.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
08.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
24.08.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200911   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]  - COZZIO R ET AL, "Neural signal processing networks for electric power distribution system control", BULLETIN DES SCHWEIZERISCHEN ELEKTROTECHNISCHEN VEREINS & DES VERBANDES SCHWEIZERISCHER ELEKTRIZITAETSWERKE, 31 MARCH 1994, SWITZERLAND, vol. 85, no. 7, ISSN 0036-1321, pages 23 - 29, XP000541260 [X] 1-4,11-15,18,19,27 * the whole document *
by applicant   - COZZIO R ET AL., "Neural signal processing networks for electric power distribution system control", BULLETIN DES SCHWEIZERISCHEN ELEKTROTECHNISCHEN VEREINS & DES VERBANDES SCHWEIZERISCHER ELECKTRIZITAETSWERKE, (19940331), vol. 85, no. 7, pages 23 - 29
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.