blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0982834

EP0982834 - Claw-pole dynamo and bicycle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.08.2006
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.08.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.09.2006  [2006/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
3-77, Oimatsu-cho
Sakai-ku
Sakai City
Osaka 590-8577 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/31]For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku, Sakai City
Osaka 590-8577 / JP
Former [2005/40]For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
77, Oimatsu-cho 3-cho, Sakai
Osaka 590 / JP
Former [2000/09]For all designated states
Shimano Inc.
77, Oimatsu-cho 3-cho, Sakai
Osaka 590 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Endo, Takahiro
2090-4 Fukaishimizu-cho
Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP
02 / Nagasaka, Magahiko
1-19-5, Taga
Nakama-shi, Fukuoka / JP
 [2005/40]
Former [2000/09]01 / Endo, Takahiro
2090-4 Fukaishimizu-cho
Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP
02 / Nagasaka, Magahiko
1-19-5, Taga
Nakamu-shi, Fukuoka / JP
Representative(s)Murnane, Graham John, et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/09]Murnane, Graham John, et al
Murgitroyd & Company, 373 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8QA / GB
Application number, filing date99306317.110.08.1999
[2000/09]
Priority number, dateJP1998023505821.08.1998         Original published format: JP 23505898
[2000/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0982834
Date:01.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0982834
Date:05.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:H02K1/14, B62J6/12, H02K21/22
[2000/09]
CPC:
B62J6/12 (EP,US); H02K1/145 (EP,US); H02K21/227 (EP,US);
H02K2201/12 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/46]
Former [2000/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Klauenpol-Dynamo für ein Fahrrad und Fahrrad[2004/44]
English:Claw-pole dynamo and bicycle[2000/09]
French:Dynamo avec pôles à griffes pour une bicyclette et bicyclette[2004/44]
Former [2000/09]Klauenpohl-Dynamo für ein Fahrrad
Former [2000/09]Dynamo avec pôles à griffes pour une bicyclette
Examination procedure23.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
02.09.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.05.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
01.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2005Fee for grant paid
28.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
08.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.01.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0591724  (SCHMIDT WILFRIED [DE]) [X] 1-8,21-24,34-38,40 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 7 * * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 24; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]FR2570228  (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]) [X] 1-8,37,38 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 26 * * page 5, line 34 - page 8, line 24; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]FR2256572  (SEV MARCHAL [FR]) [A] 1,2 * page 1, line 15 - page 3, line 10 * * page 6, lines 18-32; figures 1-4 *;
 [XA]JPS63157648  ;
 [X]DE29806210U  (ATTEND IND CO [TW]) [X] 1,34-37 * page 8, line 4 - page 9, line 176; figures 6-9 *;
 [A]JPH07236238
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881108), vol. 12, no. 420, Database accession no. (E - 679), & JP63157648 A 19880630 (NIPPON DENSO CO LTD) [X] 1,34,35,37,40 * abstract * [A] 21,28
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960131), vol. 1996, no. 1, & JP07236238 A 19950905 (SHIBAURA ENG WORKS CO LTD) [A] 1-8,21,22,30,32 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.