blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0982277

EP0982277 - Method for preparing ceramic compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.05.2003
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY
100 Independence Mall West
Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/09]For all designated states
ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY
100 Independence Mall West
Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Tang, Xun
749 Castlewood Drive
Dresher, Pennsylvania 19025 / US
02 / Wu, Xianliang
737 Castlewood Drive
Dresher, Pennsylvania 19025 / US
03 / Molnar, Linda Katherine
310 Saw Mill Lane, Apt. 3E
Horsham, Pennsylvania 19044 / US
[2000/09]
Representative(s)Buckley, Guy Julian
Patent Outsourcing Limited
1 King Street
Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Buckley, Guy Julian
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
Former [2000/09]Buckley, Guy Julian
ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue
Croydon CR9 3NB / GB
Application number, filing date99306335.311.08.1999
[2000/09]
Priority number, dateUS1999031376618.05.1999         Original published format: US 313766
US19980097354P21.08.1998         Original published format: US 97354 P
[2000/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0982277
Date:01.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0982277
Date:10.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:C04B35/634, C04B33/18, B44F9/04
[2000/09]
CPC:
C04B35/63404 (EP,US); C04B35/00 (KR); B44F9/04 (EP,US);
C04B33/18 (EP,US); C04B35/634 (EP,US); C04B35/63424 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/46]
Former [2000/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von keramischen Massen[2000/09]
English:Method for preparing ceramic compositions[2000/09]
French:Procédé de préparation de compositions céramiques[2000/09]
Examination procedure23.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
27.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.12.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2002Fee for grant paid
07.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0650946  (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 9,10 * example -; claims 3,7 * [A] 1,3,4;
 [XA]  - WU X KEVIN ET AL, "Acrylic binders for dry pressing ceramics", CERAMIC ENGINEERING AND SCIENCE PROCEEDINGS, (1997), vol. 18, no. 2, pages 422 - 438, XP002123184 [X] 9,10 * page 422, column 1 - page 423, column 3 * * figures 9,10 * [A] 1,3,4
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.