EP0979947 - Turbomolecular pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOC Edwards Japan Limited Shuwa Shiba Park Building A-3F 4-1, Shibakoen 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states BOC Edwards Japan Limited Shuwa Shiba Park Building A-3F 4-1, Shibakoen 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | ||
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states SEIKO SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-1, Yashiki 4-chome Narashino-shi Chiba / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamauchi, Akira Seiko Seiki K.K., 3-1 Yashiki, 4-chome Narashino-shi, Chiba / JP | 02 /
Nonaka, Manabu Seiko Seiki K.K., 3-1 Yashiki, 4-chome Narashino-shi, Chiba / JP | 03 /
Okada, Takashi Seiko Seiki K.K., 3-1 Yashiki, 4-chome Narashino-shi, Chiba / JP | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 99306359.3 | 11.08.1999 | [2000/07] | Priority number, date | JP19980227922 | 12.08.1998 Original published format: JP 22792298 | [2000/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0979947 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0979947 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | [2001/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F04D19/04, F04D29/58 | [2000/07] | CPC: |
F04D19/042 (EP);
F04D29/00 (KR);
F04D29/542 (EP);
F04D29/5853 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/51] |
Former [2000/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Turbomolekularpumpe | [2000/07] | English: | Turbomolecular pump | [2000/07] | French: | Pompe turbomoléculair | [2000/07] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 01.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/35] | 04.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH04330397 ; | [A]JPS63109299 ; | [A]US4695223 (CASPAR HANS-PETER [DE], et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930331), vol. 017, no. 168, Database accession no. (M - 1391), & JP04330397 A 19921118 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880919), vol. 012, no. 347, Database accession no. (M - 743), & JP63109299 A 19880513 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |