EP0980150 - Multiple user CDMA basestation modem [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St.Laurent Québec H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St.Laurent, Québec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | ||
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Corporation World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St Antoine Street West, 8th Floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Heeswyk, Frank 1-101 Renfew Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1S 1Z6 / CA | 02 /
Newson, Paul 54 Allée de Tillet 78870 Bailly, Yvelines / FR | [2000/18] |
Former [2000/07] | 01 /
Van Heeswyk, Frank 1-101 Renfew Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1S 1Z6 / CA | ||
02 /
Newson, Paul 22 Kingsford Crescent Kanata, Ontario K2K 1T4 / CA | Representative(s) | Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan, et al Scott & York Intelleczual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [2004/15] | Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan, et al Sommerville & Rushton, 45 Grosvenor Road St Albans, Herts. AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [2004/03] | Free, Rachel, Dr., et al Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road Harlow Essex CM17 9NA / GB | ||
Former [2003/15] | Stainthorpe, Vanessa J. Harrison Goddard Foote, Fountain Precinct, Leopold Street Sheffield S1 2QD / GB | ||
Former [2001/42] | Harrison Goddard Foote Orlando House 11c Compstall Road Marple Bridge Stockport SK6 5HH / GB | ||
Former [2000/18] | Dearling, Bruce Clive, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley, Merlin House, Falconry Court, Bakers Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2000/07] | Funnell, Samantha Jane, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99306360.1 | 11.08.1999 | [2000/07] | Priority number, date | US19980132466 | 11.08.1998 Original published format: US 132466 | [2000/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0980150 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0980150 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0980150 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707, H04B7/26, H04L27/00, H04L1/00 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
H04B1/707 (EP,US);
H04B7/2628 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/07] | H04B1/707, H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/50] |
Former [2000/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mehrbenutzer CDMA Basisstationsmodem | [2000/07] | English: | Multiple user CDMA basestation modem | [2000/07] | French: | Modem de station de base à AMRC pour usagers multiples | [2000/07] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 22.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2006/36] |
Former [2006/35] | DE | 30.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0828361 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1,10 * column 2, line 22 - line 40 * * column 5, line 5 - column 6, line 56 * * column 10, line 12 - column 11, line 11 * * figures 1A,1B *; | [XA]EP0847169 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [X] 20-22,27,30 * abstract * * page 2, line 14 - line 31 * * page 4, line 5 - line 13 * * page 4, line 19 - line 44 * * page 5, line 31 - line 35 * * page 5, line 47 - page 6, line 36 * * figures 2,3,10 * [A] 28,29; | [A]US5689816 (LEE TONY SIUMAN [US], et al) [A] 27 * column 1, line 23 - line 27 * * column 4, line 13 - line 38 *; | [X]EP0797327 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 23-26 * column A * * column 4, line 20 - line 29 * * figures 1B,2 * * claims 11-18 * | [A] - DOHI T ET AL, "Experiments on coherent multicode DS-CDMA", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1996. MOBILE TECHNOLOGY FOR THE HUMAN RACE., IEEE 46TH ATLANTA, GA, USA 28 APRIL-1 MAY 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19960428), ISBN 0-7803-3157-5, pages 889 - 893, XP010162517 [A] 1,10 * page 889, column R, line 3 - page 890, column L, line 4 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETEC.1996.501439 | [X] - TOSKALA A ET AL, "FRAMES FMA2 WIDEBAND-CDMA FOR UMTS", EUROPEAN TRANSACTIONS ON TELECOMMUNICATIONS, EUREL PUBLICATION, MILANO, IT, (19980701), vol. 9, no. 4, ISSN 1124-318X, pages 325 - 335, XP000778096 [X] 23-26 * page 329, column R, line 22 - page 330, column L, line 43 * * page 331, column L, line 29 - column R, line 6 * * figure 6 * |