EP0982944 - Split mirrored panoramic image display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nalwa, Vishvjit Singh 1902 Knollwood Drive Middletown, New Jersey 07748 / US | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, Postfach 19 64 85319 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2001/19] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2000/09] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99306465.8 | 17.08.1999 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | US19980143414 | 28.08.1998 Original published format: US 143414 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0982944 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/18, G02B27/14, G03B37/04 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
G06T3/4038 (EP,US);
G03B37/00 (KR);
G03B37/04 (EP,US);
H04N23/698 (EP,US);
H04N7/181 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/46] |
Former [2000/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Panoramisches Bildanzeigegerät mit Spiegelbild | [2000/09] | English: | Split mirrored panoramic image display | [2000/09] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage des images panoramiques à image miroir | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 16.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/15] | 24.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0740177 (AT & T CORP [US]) [DA] 1 * column 5, line 33 - line 47 *; | [A]WO9743854 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US5708469 (HERZBERG LOUIS PAUL [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |