blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0981189

EP0981189 - Method and apparatus using four wave mixing for optical wavelength conversion [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.05.2008
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.05.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.07.2008  [2008/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/30]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shukunami, Norifumi, Fujitsu Hokkaido Dig.Tec.Ltd
3-1, Nishi 4-chome, Kita 7-jo, Kita-ku
Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060-0807 / JP
02 / Hashi, Toshio, Fujitsu Hokkaido Dig. Tec. Ltd
3-1, Nishi 4-chome, Kita 7-jo, Kita-ku
Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060-0807 / JP
03 / Kinoshita, Susumu, Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
 [2007/18]
Former [2000/08]01 / Shukunami, Norifumi, Fujitsu Hokkaido Dig.Tec.Ltd
3-1, Nishi 4-chome, Kita 7-jo, Kita-ku
Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060-0807 / JP
02 / Hashi, Toshio, Fujitsu Hokkaido Dig. Tec. Ltd
3-1, Nishi 4-chome, Kita 7-jo, Kita-ku
Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060-0807 / JP
03 / Kinoshita, Susumu, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1,Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Representative(s)Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Fenlon, Christine Lesley, et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date99306577.019.08.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateJP1998023307019.08.1998         Original published format: JP 23307098
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0981189
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0981189
Date:16.07.2003
[2003/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0981189
Date:25.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.2003
ClassificationIPC:H01S3/067, G02F1/35
[2007/07]
CPC:
G02F1/3536 (EP,US); H01S3/06754 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/08]H01S3/063, G02F1/35
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB [2004/15]
Former [2000/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur optischen Wellenlängenkonversion durch Vierwellenmischung[2000/08]
English:Method and apparatus using four wave mixing for optical wavelength conversion[2000/08]
French:Méthode et appareil pour la conversion de longueur d'onde par mélange à quatre ondes[2000/08]
Examination procedure29.09.2003Examination requested  [2003/48]
31.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.09.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
24.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.06.2007Fee for grant paid
04.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.04.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27]
Request for further processing for:24.11.2006Request for further processing filed
22.11.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.12.2006Decision despatched
04.01.2006Request for further processing filed
11.01.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.01.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
29.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0691716  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1,13,39,52,65,72 * abstract * * figure 3 *;
 [X]EP0730191  (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 13-21 * abstract *
 [X]  - FISCHER B ET AL, "Nonlinear four-wave mixing in erbium-doped fibre amplifiers", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, 14 OCT. 1993, UK, vol. 29, no. 21, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 1858 - 1859, XP002241525 [X] 1-7,9-15,19-21,27,28,36-41,43,44,48-54,57,58,61-65,67,70-74,80-85 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.