EP0983843 - Low temperature co-fired ceramic [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2001 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.01.2002 [2002/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CTS Corporation 905 West Boulevard North Elkhart, Indiana 46514-1899 / US | [2000/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Black, Marc A. 54400 Ironwood Road, South Bend St. Joseph, IN 46635 / US | 02 /
Ernsberger, Craig N. 50705 Tecumseh, Granger St. Joseph, IN 46530 / US | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Loven, Keith James, et al Loven Patents & Trademarks West Central Runcorn Road Lincoln LN6 3QP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | Loven, Keith James, et al Loven & Co Quantum House 30 Tentercroft Street Lincoln LN5 7DB / GB | Application number, filing date | 99306622.4 | 20.08.1999 | [2000/10] | Priority number, date | US19980144429 | 31.08.1998 Original published format: US 144429 | [2000/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0983843 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0983843 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B32B18/00, H01L21/48 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
B32B18/00 (EP);
H01L21/481 (EP);
C04B2235/656 (EP);
C04B2235/96 (EP);
C04B2237/32 (EP);
C04B2237/68 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/10] | B32B18/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/19] |
Former [2000/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bei niedriger Temperatur simultan gebrannte Keramik | [2000/10] | English: | Low temperature co-fired ceramic | [2000/10] | French: | Céramique à cuisson simultanée à basse température | [2000/10] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/05] | 01.08.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.05.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.05.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5102720 (RAJ RISHI) [X] 1-14 * claims 1,4 * * column 2, line 34 - line 55 * * column 3, line 48 - column 5, line 7 * * figure - * |