blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0984341

EP0984341 - Method for attaching electrostatic photosensitive drum, method for replacing eletrophotographic photosensitive drum, and process cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.07.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.08.2004  [2004/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Murayama, Kazunari
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Kojima, Hisayoshi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Mori, Tomonori
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/10]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al
BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date99306892.331.08.1999
[2000/10]
Priority number, dateJP1998024522231.08.1998         Original published format: JP 24522298
[2000/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0984341
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0984341
Date:14.02.2001
[2001/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.01.2001
ClassificationIPC:G03G21/18
[2000/10]
CPC:
G03G21/181 (EP,US); G03G15/00 (KR); G03G21/185 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0177 (EP,US); G03G2221/1606 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2001/44]
Former [2000/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Einsetzen einer elektrostatischen photoempfindlichen Trommel, Verfahren zum Ersetzen einer elektrophotographischen photoempfindlichen Trommel und Arbeitseinheit[2000/10]
English:Method for attaching electrostatic photosensitive drum, method for replacing eletrophotographic photosensitive drum, and process cartridge[2000/10]
French:Méthode d'insertion d'un tambour électrostatique photosensible, méthode de remplacement d'un tambour électrophotographique photosensible et unité de traitement[2000/10]
Examination procedure02.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/35]
01.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/34]
19.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0467418  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 11-18,20,21 * column 8, line 37 - column 9, line 2 * * column 12, line 23 - line 51; figures 8,16 * [A] 1,6,19;
 [X]JPH086470  ;
 [X]JPH06130874  ;
 [A]JPH05257342
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, & JP08006470 A 19960112 (CANON INC) [X] 11,20 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940809), vol. 018, no. 426, Database accession no. (P - 1784), & JP06130874 A 19940513 (CANON INC) [X] 11,20 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940113), vol. 018, no. 021, Database accession no. (P - 1674), & JP05257342 A 19931008 (CANON INC) [A] 1,6,19 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.