EP0986190 - Echo controller with compensation for variable delay networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St.Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | ||
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states NORTEL NETWORKS CORPORATION World Trade Center of Montreal 380 St. Antoine Street West 8TH FLOOR Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McClennon, Scott R. 209 Chandler Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K2C OG3 / CA | 02 /
Robert, Andre J. 103 Sol Lane RR No. 2 Woodlawn, Ontario K0A 3MO / CA | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al F. R. KELLY & CO. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2000/37] | Bewley, Ewan Stuart, et al Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | ||
Former [2000/11] | Humphrey-Evans, Edward John, et al Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99306987.1 | 02.09.1999 | [2000/11] | Priority number, date | US19980150698 | 10.09.1998 Original published format: US 150698 | [2000/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0986190 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0986190 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | [2005/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0986190 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/20, H04M9/08, H04B3/23, H04M3/00 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
H04M3/002 (EP,US);
H04B3/23 (EP,US);
H04M7/1275 (EP,US);
H04J3/0682 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/11] | H04B3/20, H04M9/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/42] |
Former [2000/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Echoregler mit Kompensation für Netzwerke mit variabler Verzögerung | [2000/11] | English: | Echo controller with compensation for variable delay networks | [2000/11] | French: | Contrôleur d'écho avec compensation pour réseaux à temps de retard variable | [2000/11] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 21.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US5099472 (TOWNSEND BRUCE L [CA], et al) [DY] 1-4,8,9,13-16,18,19 * abstract *; | [A]US5381475 (CAVALLO MARK C [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * column 1, line 30 - column 2, line 24 * * column 3, line 20 - line 50 ** column 4, line 7 - line 40 *; | [A]US5781554 (ORGAN RUPERT J [GB]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - column 3, line 8 *; | [Y] - VICKERS R ET AL, "Voice on ATM-issues and potential solutions", COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGY PROCEEDINGS, 1996. ICCT'96., 1996 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BEIJING, CHINA 5-7 MAY 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19960505), ISBN 0-7803-2916-3, pages 1037 - 1040, XP010532986 [Y] 1-4,8,9,13-16,18,19 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCT.1996.545059 | [A] - DEMPSEY B J ET AL, "An empirical study of packet voice distribution over a campus-wide network", LOCAL COMPUTER NETWORKS, 1994. PROCEEDINGS., 19TH CONFERENCE ON MINNEAPOLIS, MN, USA 2-5 OCT. 1994, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, (19941002), ISBN 0-8186-6680-3, pages 456 - 465, XP010128901 [A] 1-19 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LCN.1994.386573 |