|
13.03.2009 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2009 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.2009 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.02.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.02.2009 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.02.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.02.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2008 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2008 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.11.2008 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
24 |
|
22.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2008 |
Description |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.01.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Description |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.06.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.03.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.11.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.06.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.06.2004 |
Invitation to file a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
08.03.2004 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2004 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2000 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2000 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2000 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2000 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2000 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.1999 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
25.10.1999 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.1999 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.09.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
10.09.1999 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.1999 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
10.09.1999 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |