EP0988974 - Ink-jet recording head driving method and ink-jet recording device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2009 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [2009/15] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Junhau c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | [2000/13] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | ||
Former [2000/13] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon, 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 99307172.9 | 10.09.1999 | [2000/13] | Priority number, date | JP19980268787 | 22.09.1998 Original published format: JP 26878798 | [2000/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0988974 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0988974 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | [2000/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0988974 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0988974 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/045 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
B41J2/04581 (EP,US);
B41J2/04588 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/16] |
Former [2000/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Steuern einer Tintenstrahldruckkopf und Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsvorrichtung | [2000/13] | English: | Ink-jet recording head driving method and ink-jet recording device | [2000/13] | French: | Procédé de commande pour tête d'enregistrement à jet d'encre et dispositif d'enregistrement à jet d'encre | [2000/13] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 18.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.09.2005
ADMISSIBLE Océ-Technologies B.V. St. Urbanusweg 43 NL-5914 CC VENLO / NL Opponent's representative Janssen, Paulus J. P. Océ-Technologies B.V. Corporate Patents P.O. Box 101 5900 MA Venlo / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.09.2005
ADMISSIBLE Océ-Technologies B.V. St. Urbanusweg 43 NL-5914 CC VENLO / NL Opponent's representative Janssen, Paulus J. P. Océ-Technologies B.V, Corporate Patents, P.O. Box 101 5900 MA Venlo / NL | 27.10.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.03.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 06.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 29.07.2008 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.08.2008 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 18.02.2009 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0841164 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,10 * abstract * * column 6, line 12 - line 39 * * column 9, line 51 - column 10, line 6 * * claim 10 *; | [Y]EP0812689 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,10 * figures 5A-5C,6,9 * * column 9, line 35 - column 10, line 12 * * column 11, line 55 - column 13, line 36 *; | [A]US5576743 (MOMOSE KAORU [JP], et al) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * column 2, line 10 - line 37 * |