EP0985556 - Tubeless tyre [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, 3-chome, Wakinohama-cho, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd. 6-9, 3-chome, Wakinohama-cho, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minami, Nobuaki 15-10-201 Aza Shirai Gakeshita Shirakawa-shi, Fukushima-ken / JP | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/33] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/11] | Stewart, Charles Geoffrey, et al Technical, Dunlop Tyres Ltd., Fort Dunlop Erdington, Birmingham B24 9QT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99307184.4 | 10.09.1999 | [2000/11] | Priority number, date | JP19980258675 | 11.09.1998 Original published format: JP 25867598 | JP19980267761 | 22.09.1998 Original published format: JP 26776198 | JP19980356504 | 15.12.1998 Original published format: JP 35650498 | JP19980356506 | 15.12.1998 Original published format: JP 35650698 | JP19990078309 | 23.03.1999 Original published format: JP 7830999 | [2000/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0985556 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0985556 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | [2001/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0985556 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60C9/02, B60C9/20, B60C15/06, B60C5/12, B60C9/09, B60C9/04 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
B60C9/08 (EP,US);
B60C15/06 (EP,US);
B60C5/12 (EP,US);
B60C9/0207 (EP,US);
B60C9/04 (EP,US);
B60C9/2009 (EP,US);
B60C2015/0642 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10819 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10837 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10864 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/11] | B60C9/02, B60C9/20, B60C15/06, B60C5/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/05] |
Former [2000/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schlauchloser Reifen | [2000/11] | English: | Tubeless tyre | [2000/11] | French: | Bandage pneumatique sans chambre à air | [2000/11] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 18.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DYA]EP0705717 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [DY] 1-3 * page 5, line 44 - page 6, line 25 * * figure 1 * [A] 9-11; | [Y]US5711829 (POLLARD ANDREW L [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 50 * * column 8, line 7 - line 14 * * figures 3-5 *; | [A]US5332017 (IMAMIYA SUSUMU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 3 - line 8 * * column 3, line 6 - line 22 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [DA]JPH06156007 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940907), vol. 018, no. 479, Database accession no. (M - 1669), & JP06156007 A 19940603 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD:THE) [DA] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH06156007 | JPH08113007 |