EP0987890 - Information processing apparatus, information processing method, and recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horiguchi, Mari Sony Corp., 7-35 Kitashinagawa, 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Kazuo Sony Corp., 7-35 Kitashinagawa, 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kawamura, Harumi Sony Corp., 7-35 Kitashinagawa, 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99307209.9 | 13.09.1999 | [2000/12] | Priority number, date | JP19980259734 | 14.09.1998 Original published format: JP 25973498 | JP19980296502 | 19.10.1998 Original published format: JP 29650298 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0987890 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0987890 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/765 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
H04L12/40117 (EP,US);
G11B15/02 (KR);
H04N5/782 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/02] |
Former [2000/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Informationsbearbeitungsanlage, Informationsbearbeitungsverfahren, und Aufnahmemedium | [2000/12] | English: | Information processing apparatus, information processing method, and recording medium | [2000/12] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'information, procédé de traitement d'information, et moyen d'enregistrement | [2000/12] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/31] | 19.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.11.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.11.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9817033 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5-7,9,11-13,17-19,21-23 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9728630 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5-7,9,11-13,15-19,21-23 * the whole document * |