blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0989737

EP0989737 - Image recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.01.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.02.2007  [2007/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KONICA CORPORATION
26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]For all designated states
KONICA CORPORATION
26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fujita, Katsushi
c/o Konica Corporation, 591-7 Kamihirose
Sayama-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Doi, Masato
c/o Konica Corporation, 591-7 Kamihirose
Sayama-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
03 / Sugita, Tsuyoshi
c/o Konica Corporation, 591-7 Kamihirose
Sayama-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
04 / Yasuaki, Tamakoshi
c/o Konica Corporation, 591-7 Kamihirose
Sayama-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
05 / Hosoi, Miyuki
c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi
Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP
06 / Sawada, Katsutoshi
c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi
Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP
[2000/13]
Representative(s)Nicholls, Michael John
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]Nicholls, Michael John
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date99307275.014.09.1999
[2000/13]
Priority number, dateJP1998028356721.09.1998         Original published format: JP 28356798
JP1999015493302.06.1999         Original published format: JP 15493399
[2000/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0989737
Date:29.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0989737
Date:24.09.2003
[2003/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.08.2003
ClassificationIPC:H04N1/50
[2000/13]
CPC:
H04N1/502 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/25]
Former [2000/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bildaufzeichnungsvorrichtung[2000/13]
English:Image recording apparatus[2000/13]
French:Appareil d'enregistrement d'image[2000/13]
Examination procedure26.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/18]
07.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/06]
20.09.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200608   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0831640  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1, lines 7,8 - lines 31-33 * * column 2, lines 26-44 * * column 8, lines 40-46 * * column 14, lines 13-16 *;
 [XY]US5740332  (MURAKAMI ATSUSHI [JP]) [X] 12 * column 1, lines 5-9 * * column 4, lines 63-67 * * column 5, lines 1-6 - lines 43-45 * * column 7, lines 1-7 * * column 8, lines 18-20 * * figure 3A * [Y] 1-7;
 [A]EP0713328  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] * abstract * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0825495  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] * abstract * * figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.