EP0987231 - Silicon carbide based composite material and manufacturing method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawai, Chihiro c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd. 1-1. Koyakita 1-chome, Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Yamagata, Shin-ichi c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd. 1-1. Koyakita 1-chome, Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Fukui, Akira c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd. 1-1. Koyakita 1-chome, Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 04 /
Takeda, Yoshinobu c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd. 1-1. Koyakita 1-chome, Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99307292.5 | 14.09.1999 | [2000/12] | Priority number, date | JP19980260003 | 14.09.1998 Original published format: JP 26000398 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0987231 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0987231 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/565, C04B35/575, C04B41/88, C22C29/06, C22C32/00, H01L23/373 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
C04B35/634 (EP,US);
B22F3/17 (EP,US);
C04B35/565 (EP,US);
C04B35/575 (EP,US);
C04B35/581 (EP,US);
C04B35/626 (EP,US);
C04B35/62645 (EP,US);
C04B35/63 (EP,US);
C04B37/006 (EP,US);
C04B41/5155 (EP,US);
C22C29/065 (EP,US);
C22C32/0063 (EP,US);
H01L23/3733 (EP,US);
B22F2003/1053 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP,US);
B32B2311/12 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3895 (EP,US);
C04B2235/40 (EP,US);
C04B2235/402 (EP,US);
C04B2235/407 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/604 (EP,US);
C04B2235/761 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP,US);
C04B2235/80 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9607 (EP,US);
C04B2237/123 (EP,US);
C04B2237/125 (EP,US);
C04B2237/30 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F3/105, B22F3/17 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00, B22F3/17, B22F3/14, B22F3/1035 (US,EP);
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/49] |
Former [2000/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kompositwerkstoff auf Siliciumcarbidbasis und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2000/12] | English: | Silicon carbide based composite material and manufacturing method thereof | [2000/12] | French: | Materiau composite à base de carbure de silicium et son procédé de fabrication | [2000/12] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 02.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02025593.1 / EP1284250 | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0995745 ; | [A]JPH08279569 ; | [A]WO9217297 (ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA [US]) [A] 1-13,21-27 * page 15, line 19 - line 30; figure 6; claims 1-72 *; | JPH09157773 [ ] (HITACHI METALS LTD); | [XA]EP0798393 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [X] 14,16-18 * claims 1-6,18-21 * [A] 1-13,15,19-27; | [AD]EP0813243 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [AD] 1-13,21-27 * claims 1-5,35 *; | [A]EP0859410 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13,21-27* figure 3; claims 1-6,11 *; | [XDA] - HAMAYOSHI, S. ET AL., "Aluminum composites having low thermal expansion coefficient ...", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19970908), vol. 127, no. 10, Database accession no. 138959, XP002123711 [XD] 14,16-18 * abstract * [A] 1-13,15,19-27 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 1997, no. 08, & JP09095745 A 19970408 (HITACHI METALS, LTD.) [A] 1-27 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08279569 A 19961022 (SUMITOMO METAL IND. LTD.) [A] 1-27 * abstract * |