EP1085290 - Cartridge clip holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Burdine, John Michael 4300 Canaan Creek Road Edmond, OK 73034 / US | [2001/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 99307352.7 | 16.09.1999 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1085290 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F42B39/00, F41A9/65 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
F41A9/65 (EP,US);
F42B39/002 (EP,US);
Y10S224/931 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/50] |
Former [2001/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Patronenstreifenhalter | [2001/12] | English: | Cartridge clip holder | [2001/12] | French: | Porteur de chargeurs de cartouches | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/27] | 05.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.11.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.11.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE192868 (WALZ) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]GB2158045 (FRIEL VERONICA CLARE) [Y] 2 * page 3, column L, line 10 - column R, line 94; figures 6-9; claims 6-8,10 *; | [Y]US4357888 (PHILLIPS JOHN C, et al) [Y] 3 * column 3, line 21 - line 35; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3785051 (DAWIDOWICZ J, et al) [A] 1,3 * column 6, line 22 - column 9, line 52; figures 9-17 *; | [AD]US5174482 (ROGERS WILLIAM H [US], et al) [AD] 1,2 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]US3696915 (DOUGLAS LIVINGSTON C) [A] 1,3 * column A; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4152857 (KETTERER DIETER) [A] 2 * column 8, line 10 - line 13; figure 5; claims 13,22 *; | [A]US4272903 (GRIFFIS WILLIAM T); | [A]DE2437096 (HERSTAL SA) | by applicant | US2902196 |