EP0998175 - Method for soldering Dpak-type electronic components to circuit boards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FORD MOTOR COMPANY The American Road Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states Ford Motor Company The American Road Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sinkunas, Peter Joseph 7111, Foxcreek Drive Canton, Michigan 48187 / US | [2000/18] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh-on-Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 99307378.2 | 17.09.1999 | [2000/18] | Priority number, date | US19980172047 | 14.10.1998 Original published format: US 172047 | [2000/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0998175 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0998175 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/34 | [2000/18] | CPC: |
H05K3/341 (EP,US);
H05K3/3494 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05553 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48472 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10166 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10969 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0405 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB [2001/03] |
Former [2000/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Löten eines D-pak Bauteiles auf einer gedruckten Schaltungsplatte | [2000/18] | English: | Method for soldering Dpak-type electronic components to circuit boards | [2000/18] | French: | Procédé pour souder des composants électroniques du type D-pak sur une plaquette de circuit imprimé | [2000/18] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 28.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 18.09.2003 | [2005/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5112635 (LIEBERMANN BENNO E [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS59150665 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841221), vol. 008, no. 280, Database accession no. (M - 347), & JP59150665 A 19840828 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 1-7 * abstract * |