EP0987711 - Reproduction method and reproduction apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sekii, Yasuaki, c/o Sony Corp. 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 99307399.8 | 17.09.1999 | [2000/12] | Priority number, date | JP19980265278 | 18.09.1998 Original published format: JP 26527898 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0987711 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0987711 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0987711 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/28 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
G11B20/10 (KR);
G11B20/1215 (EP,US);
G11B20/1262 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/11 (EP,US);
G11B27/3063 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B2220/235 (EP,US);
G11B2220/237 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/05] |
Former [2000/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wiedergabeverfahren und Wiedergabegerät | [2000/12] | English: | Reproduction method and reproduction apparatus | [2000/12] | French: | Méthode de reproduction et appareil de reproduction | [2000/12] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 04.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0718845 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 6, line 11 - column 14, line 51; figure - *; | [A]EP0406021 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-8 * page 6, line 26 - page 9, line 32 *; | [A]EP0715301 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 19; figures 1,3,5 *; | [A]US5570340 (LEE DEOK-HYUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 10; figures 1-10 * |