|
15.04.2013 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.06.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2006 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2006 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.08.2006 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2006 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2006 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2000 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2000 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.1999 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.09.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
20.09.1999 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.1999 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
20.09.1999 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.09.1999 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
63 |
|
20.09.1999 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
66 |