19.04.2013 |
Refusal of application |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
04.01.2013 |
Change: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
04.01.2013 |
Change: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
21.12.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
21.12.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
24.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.08.2012 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
22.06.2012 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
27.09.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.05.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.01.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.02.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.10.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.10.2009 |
First examination report |
|
22.09.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.09.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2007 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
30.03.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] |
21.09.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.08.2006 |
Publication of search report |
published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
28.07.2006 |
Change or deletion - publication of search report |
published on 28.07.2006 [2006/35] |
14.07.2006 |
Publication of search report |
published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] |
30.06.2006 |
Change or deletion - publication of search report |
published on 30.06.2006 [2006/31] |
12.05.2006 |
Publication of search report |
published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] |
12.05.2006 |
Change or deletion - publication of search report |
published on 12.05.2006 [2006/24] |
14.04.2006 |
Publication of search report |
published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] |
22.09.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.09.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.09.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.09.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.02.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] |