EP0987896 - Transmission system and method, signal adjusting apparatus and method, and routing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Furukawa, Jun c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hirasawa, Takashi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Satoh, Kimiyasu c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Mita, Michio c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Turner, James Arthur, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Turner, James Arthur, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99307416.0 | 20.09.1999 | [2000/12] | Priority number, date | JP19980264820 | 18.09.1998 Original published format: JP 26482098 | JP19980270050 | 24.09.1998 Original published format: JP 27005098 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0987896 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0987896 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | [2006/36] |
Former [2006/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | |
No.: | EP0987896 | ||
Date: | |||
Status: | (deleted) | ||
[2006/35] | |||
[2006/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04H60/04 (EP,US);
H04H60/07 (EP,US);
H04N17/004 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/23614 (EP,US);
H04N21/2362 (EP,US);
H04N21/2365 (EP,US);
H04N21/258 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2007/19] |
Former [2000/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Ubertragung, Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Signaleinstellung sowie Vorrichtung zur Leitweglenkung | [2000/12] | English: | Transmission system and method, signal adjusting apparatus and method, and routing apparatus | [2000/12] | French: | Système et méthode de transmission, dispositif et méthode d'ajustement de signal, et dispositif d'acheminement | [2000/12] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 06.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/21] | 30.10.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/21] | 04.01.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0837609 (NEXTLEVEL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * page 2, line 5 - line 40 *; | [X] - CARTWRIGHT C T, "Issues in multiplex and service management in digital multichannel broadcasting", BROADCASTING CONVENTION, 1997. IBS 97., INTERNATIONAL (CONF. PUBL. 447) AMSTERDAM, NETHERLANDS 12-16 SEPT. 1997, LONDON, UK,IEE, UK, (19970912), ISBN 0-85296-694-6, pages 308 - 313, XP006508775 [X] 1-6 * page 312, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/cp:19971288 | [A] - CANIZARES P ET AL, "The first Spanish experience on digital terrestrial television broadcasting", BROADCASTING CONVENTION, INTERNATIONAL (CONF. PUBL. NO. 428) AMSTERDAM, NETHERLANDS 12-16 SEPT. 1996, LONDON, UK,IEE, UK, (19960912), ISBN 0-85296-663-6, pages 196 - 199, XP006510018 [A] 1-6 * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/cp:19960805 | [A] - KNEIP M ET AL, "Control and supervision of a digital broadcast network", BROADCASTING CONVENTION, INTERNATIONAL (CONF. PUBL. NO. 428) AMSTERDAM, NETHERLANDS 12-16 SEPT. 1996, LONDON, UK,IEE, UK, (19960912), ISBN 0-85296-663-6, pages 55 - 60, XP006509994 [A] 1-6 * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/cp:19960782 | [A] - BUNGUM O W, "Transmultiplexing, transcontrol and transscrambling of MPEG-2/DVB signal", BROADCASTING CONVENTION, INTERNATIONAL (CONF. PUBL. NO. 428) AMSTERDAM, NETHERLANDS 12-16 SEPT. 1996, LONDON, UK,IEE, UK, (19960912), ISBN 0-85296-663-6, pages 288 - 293, XP006510034 [A] 1-6 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/cp:19960822 |