EP0993059 - Via filled interconnect for solid oxide fuel cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOFCo, L.P. 2425 South 900 West Salt Lake City, Utah 84119 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states Sofco 2425 South 900 West Salt Lake City, Utah 84119 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartvigsen, Joseph Jay 1529 South 400 East Kaysville, Utah 84037 / US | 02 /
Khandkar, Ashok Chandrashekhar 2116 S. Lakeline Drive Salt Lake City, Utah 84109 / US | 03 /
Elangovan, Singaravelu 11562 South Dry Creek Road Sandy, Utah 84094 / US | [2001/45] |
Former [2000/15] | 01 /
Hartvigsen, Joseph Jay 1539 South 400 East Kaysville, Utah 84037 / US | ||
02 /
Khandkar, Ashok Chandrashekhar 2116 S. Lakeline Drive Salt Lake City, Utah 84109 / US | |||
03 /
Elangovan, Singaravelu 11562 South Dry Creek Road Sandy, Utah 84094 / US | Representative(s) | Flynn, Michael Joseph William Jones Willow Lane House Willow Lane Norwich NR2 1EU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Flynn, Michael Joseph William Jones, Willow Lane House, Willow Lane Norwich NR2 1EU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99307432.7 | 15.09.1999 | [2000/15] | Priority number, date | US19980153959 | 16.09.1998 Original published format: US 153959 | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0993059 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0993059 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | [2000/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0993059 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, H01M8/24 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
H01M8/0256 (EP,US);
H01M8/0208 (EP,US);
H01M8/0217 (EP,US);
H01M8/2432 (EP);
H01M2008/1293 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0074 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI, NL [2001/02] |
Former [2000/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbundleiterplatte mit verfüllten Durchgangslöchern für Festelektrolyt-Brennstoffzellen | [2000/15] | English: | Via filled interconnect for solid oxide fuel cells | [2000/15] | French: | Interconnection à vias remplis pour piles à combustible à oxyde solide | [2000/15] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 20.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.10.2000 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   31.10.2000 | 31.10.2000 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   31.10.2000 | 31.10.2000 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   31.10.2000 | 31.10.2000 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   31.10.2000 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 31.10.2000 | M01   Fee paid on   31.10.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5496655 (LESSING PAUL A [US]) [A] 1-20 * figure 4 * * column 5, lines 19-57 * * column 9, line 60 - column 11, line 8 *; | [A]US5279906 (YOSHIMURA TAKAYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US5342705 (MINH NGUYEN Q [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 4, lines 15-44 * |