Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000160128 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP26505399 | 20.09.1999 | JP26969298 | 24.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0989172 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP26969298 | 24.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1166746C | 15.09.2004 | C | CN1248604 | 29.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP26969298 | 24.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100620131B | 06.09.2006 | B1 | KR20000023422 | 25.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP26969298 | 24.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW506999B | 21.10.2002 | B | Priority number | Date | JP26969298 | 24.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6841605 | 11.01.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP26969298 | 24.09.1998 |