EP0989172 - Adhesive composition for metal foil, adhesive-coated metal foil, metal clad laminate and related materials using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2003 | Change - oral proceedings | 25.04.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.06.2003 [2003/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states HITACHI CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 1-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kumakura, Toshihisa 1391-523, Ogawa Shimodate-shi, Ibaraki / JP | 02 /
Horiuchi, Takeshi 6500-12, Tomonuma, Nogimachi Shimotsuga-gun, Tochigi / JP | 03 /
Magome, Kazuyuki Shisui-ryo, 240, Ozakata Shimodate-shi, Ibaraki / JP | 04 /
Shiraishi, Norifumi Noda-ryo, 267, Nakazato Noda-shi, Chiba / JP | [2000/13] | Representative(s) | Watkins, David, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | Watkins, David, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99307434.3 | 21.09.1999 | [2000/13] | Priority number, date | JP19980269692 | 24.09.1998 Original published format: JP 26969298 | [2000/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0989172 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C09J129/14, B32B7/12, B32B15/08, H05K1/00 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
C09J129/14 (EP,KR,US);
B32B15/14 (US);
C09J133/06 (KR);
H05K3/386 (EP,US);
H05K3/46 (KR);
B32B2457/08 (US);
C08L2666/14 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0209 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0355 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0358 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0769 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2804 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09J129/14, C08L2666/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB [2000/50] |
Former [2000/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kleber für metallische Folien, mit diesem Kleber überzogene metallische Folie, mit der metallischen Folie überzogene Schichtplatte und daraus hergestellte Erzeugnisse | [2000/13] | English: | Adhesive composition for metal foil, adhesive-coated metal foil, metal clad laminate and related materials using the same | [2000/13] | French: | Composition adhésive pour feuille métallique, feuille métallique revêtue d'adhésif, laminé recouvert de métal et matériaux faits à partir de ces laminés | [2000/13] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 20.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07258619 ; | [A]DE1293367 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-18 * claims 1,2 *; | [XY]US3616195 (RENDLEMAN HAROLD A, et al) [X] 1-16 * claims 1,4-6; tables I,II * [Y] 17,18; | [YA]EP0275070 (KOLLMORGEN CORP [US]) [Y] 17,18 * claim 1 * [A] 1-16; | [A]EP0439828 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-18 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5066691 (KUMAKURA TOSHIHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07258619 A 19951009 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1-18 * abstract * |