EP0993123 - An A/D conversion apparatus and a radio apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | ||
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasuda, Akira, IP Division, Toshiba Corporation 1-1-1, Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Waldren, Robin Michael Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Waldren, Robin Michael MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99307670.2 | 29.09.1999 | [2000/15] | Priority number, date | JP19980276040 | 29.09.1998 Original published format: JP 27604098 | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0993123 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0993123 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | [2002/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0993123 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H03M3/04, H03M1/06 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
H03M1/0668 (EP,US);
H03M1/747 (EP,US);
H03M3/40 (EP,US);
H03M3/41 (EP,US);
H03M3/424 (EP,US);
H03M3/456 (EP,US);
H03M3/464 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/42] |
Former [2000/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | A/D-Wandler und Radiogerät | [2000/15] | English: | An A/D conversion apparatus and a radio apparatus | [2000/15] | French: | Appareil de conversion A/N et radio | [2000/15] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 21.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0704978 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 1-7,10-21 * figures 1,9,12,26-28 *; | [A]IE960171 (UNIV CORK) [A] 1-7,10-21 * page 3, line 32 - line 36 * * page 7, line 13 - page 8, column 6 * * figure 4 * | [Y] - TAO ET AL, "Bandpass sigma-delta modulation using frequency translation", CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 1997. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 40TH MIDWEST SYMPOSIUM ON SACRAMENTO, CA, USA 3-6 AUG. 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19970803), ISBN 0-7803-3694-1, pages 297 - 300, XP010272546 [Y] 1-7,10-21 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWSCAS.1997.666092 |