EP0993958 - Method and apparatus for stencil printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.2005 [2005/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Riso Kagaku Corporation 2-20-15, Shinbashi, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | For all designated states RISO KAGAKU CORPORATION 2-20-15, Shinbashi, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2000/16] | For all designated states RISO KAGAKU CORPORATION 2-20-15, Shimbashi, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isozaki, Takashi, Riso Kagaku Corp. R & D Center 1339-2 Wakaguri Nishikanda, Amimachi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken 300-0333 / JP | 02 /
Kato, Hiroyasu, Riso Kagaku Corp. R & D Center 1339-2 Wakaguri Nishikanda, Amimachi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken 300-0333 / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Kenji, Riso Kagaku Corp. R & D Center 1339-2 Wakaguri Nishikanda, Amimachi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken 300-0333 / JP | 04 /
Okuda, Sadanao, Riso Kagaku Corp. R & D Center 1339-2 Wakaguri Nishikanda, Amimachi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken 300-0333 / JP | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | Eder, Ephry Bromhead Johnson Sovereign House 212-224 Shaftesbury Avenue London WC2H 8HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | Eder, Ephry E. EDER & CO. 39 Cranbrook Road Ilford, Essex IG1 4PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99307768.4 | 01.10.1999 | [2000/16] | Priority number, date | JP19980293752 | 15.10.1998 Original published format: JP 29375298 | [2000/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0993958 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0993958 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41L13/06 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
B41L13/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/01] |
Former [2000/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schablonendruckverfahren und Vorrichtung | [2000/16] | English: | Method and apparatus for stencil printing | [2000/16] | French: | Procédé et appareil d'impression au pochoir | [2000/16] | Examination procedure | 18.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 06.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0653312 (RISO KAGAKU CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0696513 (RISO KAGAKU CORP [JP]); | [A]US4107003 (ANSELRODE LODEWIJK); | [A]US4497249 (MITTER MATHIAS [DE]); | [A]US3971313 (VOEGELIN HEINRICH) |