EP0997831 - Intrinsically safe monitoring device and data acquisition system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M-I L.L.C. 1201 Louisiana Street, 9th floor Houston TX 77002 / US | [2000/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burkhard, Alan W. 1804 Whispering Creek Edmond, Oklahoma 73013 / US | [2000/18] | Representative(s) | Flint, Adam Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | Flint, Adam W.H. Beck, Greener & Co., 7 Stone Buildings, Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99308404.5 | 25.10.1999 | [2000/18] | Priority number, date | US19980106355P | 29.10.1998 Original published format: US 106355 P | US19980193774 | 17.11.1998 Original published format: US 193774 | [2000/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0997831 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0997831 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | [2001/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/40, H02H9/00 | [2000/18] | CPC: |
E21B44/00 (EP,US);
H02H9/008 (EP,US);
G05B2219/24028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/18] | Extension states | RO | 19.09.2001 | Title | German: | Eigensichere Überwachungsvorrichtung und System und Verfahren zur Datenerfassung | [2000/18] | English: | Intrinsically safe monitoring device and data acquisition system and method | [2000/18] | French: | Dispositif de surveillance à sécurité intrinsèque et système et procédé d'acquisition de données | [2000/18] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 18.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/50] | 24.07.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.08.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.11.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4410949 (HUELLINGHORST THOMAS R [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * column 3, line 19 - line 29 *; | [Y]US5583764 (NAIL GEORGE M [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * column 15, line 41 - column 16, line 32; figures 1,13 *; | [PX]US5841648 (MANSFIELD WILLIAM M [US]) [PX] 1-6* column A * | by applicant | US4455509 | US5583764 |