Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.02.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] |
31.01.2003 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] |
23.10.2002 | Renewal fee | |
07.10.2002 | Change - oral proceedings | |
06.09.2002 | Loss of particular rights | |
17.07.2002 | Examination report or reply | |
25.06.2002 | Change - extension states | |
22.05.2002 | Loss of particular rights | |
21.05.2002 | Loss of particular rights | |
02.03.2002 | Definitive list of designations | published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] |
02.03.2002 | First examination report | |
01.03.2002 | Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) | |
26.02.2002 | Examination report or reply | |
07.12.2001 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.01.2002 [2002/04] |
18.10.2001 | Renewal fee | |
08.06.2001 | Publication of search report | published on 25.07.2001 [2001/30] |
17.03.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] |