EP0997675 - Solenoid valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMC CORPORATION 16-4, Shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states SMC CORPORATION 16-4, Shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Hideharu, SMC Corporation Tsukuba Techn. Ctr 4-2-2 Kinunodai, Yawara-mura Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki / JP | 02 /
Hangai, Masayuki, SMC Corp. Tsukuba Techn. Center 4-2-2 Kinunodai, Yawara-mura Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki / JP | [2000/18] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99308480.5 | 26.10.1999 | [2000/18] | Priority number, date | JP19980310666 | 30.10.1998 Original published format: JP 31066698 | JP19980310667 | 30.10.1998 Original published format: JP 31066798 | [2000/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0997675 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0997675 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | [2001/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/06, F15B21/06 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
F16K31/0634 (EP,US);
F16K31/06 (KR);
F16K11/105 (EP,US);
Y10S137/909 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/18] | F16K31/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/15] |
Former [2000/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektromagnetisches Ventil | [2000/18] | English: | Solenoid valve | [2000/18] | French: | Soupape électromagnétique | [2000/18] | Examination procedure | 08.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/18] | 19.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/37] | 10.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS57145565 ; | [A]JPS5771108 ; | [A]EP0052177 (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * page 3, line 3 - line 31 * * page 5, lines 13-18 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5441233 (ASOU YOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,5 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9804846 (UNIV AND COMMUNI BOARD OF REGE [US]) [A] 1 * abstract ** figure 3A * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821207), vol. 006, no. 247, Database accession no. (E - 146), & JP57145565 A 19820908 (MITSUBISHI DENKI KK) [A] 1,3,4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820806), vol. 006, no. 147, Database accession no. (E - 123), & JP57071108 A 19820501 (AISIN SEIKI CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |