EP1000792 - Transfer case with four-wheel underdrive operating mode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2001 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borg-Warner Automotive, Inc. 3001 West Big Beaver Road Suite 200 P.O. Box 5060 Troy MI 48007-5060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states Borg-Warner Automotive, Inc. 3001 West Big Beaver Road, Suite 200, P.O. Box 5060 Troy, Michigan 48007-5060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Showalter, Dan J. 9320 Pineview Drive Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 99308609.9 | 29.10.1999 | [2000/20] | Priority number, date | US19980191186 | 13.11.1998 Original published format: US 191186 | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1000792 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/346, B60K23/08 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
B60K17/3467 (EP,US);
F16H2063/3056 (EP,US);
F16H63/304 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verteilergetriebe mit Vierradantrieb im Langsamgang-Fahrmodus | [2000/20] | English: | Transfer case with four-wheel underdrive operating mode | [2000/20] | French: | Boîte de transfert avec mode de conduite à quatre roues motrices avec sousmultiplication de vitesse | [2000/20] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US4440042 |