EP1001378 - Storage device and image data processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shino, Toshiaki, Sony-Kihara Research Center Inc. 1-14-10 Higashi Gotanda, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | Jackson, Jonathan Andrew, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2007/51] | Turner, James Arthur, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2000/20] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99308797.2 | 04.11.1999 | [2000/20] | Priority number, date | JP19980318133 | 09.11.1998 Original published format: JP 31813398 | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1001378 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1001378 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/00, G06F5/06 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
G06T15/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/20] | G06T15/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/17] |
Former [2000/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Speichergerät und datenverarbeitungsgerät | [2000/20] | English: | Storage device and image data processing apparatus | [2000/20] | French: | Dispositif d'enregistrement et appareil de traitement de données | [2000/20] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 11.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2014 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 22.04.2014 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 08.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.11.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 15.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4230195 (SILICON SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 5 * * column 5, line 26 - line 47 ** column 7, line 41 - column 8, line 25 *; | [A] - OLSON T, "VARIABLE-WIDTH FIFO BUFFER SEQUENCES LARGE DATA WORDS", ELECTRONIC DESIGN, PENTON PUBLISHING, CLEVELAND, OH, US, (19870611), vol. 35, no. 14, ISSN 0013-4872, pages 117 - 120,122, XP000022981 [A] 1,5 * page 117, column R, line 3 - line 6 * * page 120, column R, line 37 - page 121, column L, line 18 * |