EP1001609 - Processing system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [2010/13] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Balasubramanian, Thyagarajan 1050 East High Vista Trail Webster, NY 14580 / US | 02 /
Eschbach, Reiner 812 Westwood Trail Webster, NY 14580 / US | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99308885.5 | 08.11.1999 | [2000/20] | Priority number, date | US19980192106 | 13.11.1998 Original published format: US 192106 | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1001609 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1001609 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | [2001/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1001609 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/52 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
H04N1/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/03] |
Former [2000/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Prozesssystem und -verfahren | [2000/20] | English: | Processing system and method | [2000/20] | French: | Système et procédé de traitement de signal | [2000/20] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 28.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5168552 (VAUGHN RONALD J [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * column A *; | [A]US5402245 (MOTTA RICARDO J [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * column A; claim - * | [PX] - R BALASUBRAMANIAN AND R ESCHBACH, "Design of UCR and GCR Stategies to Reduce Moiré in Color Printing", PICS 1999, Savannah, Georgia, US, vol. 2, ISBN 0-89208-215-1, (199904), pages 390 - 393, XP002161430 [PX] 1-4 * column W * |