EP1005205 - Fast start-up for multicarrier systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2004 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larsson, Patrik 10a Stillwell Street Matawan, New Jersey 07747 / US | 02 /
Werner, Jean-Jacques 852 Holmdel Road Holmdel, New Jersey 07733 / US | 03 /
Yang, Jian 10 Whitney Drive Marlboro, New Jersey 07746 / US | [2000/22] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99309080.2 | 16.11.1999 | [2000/22] | Priority number, date | US19980199775 | 25.11.1998 Original published format: US 199775 | [2000/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1005205 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1005205 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26, H04L25/03 | [2000/22] | CPC: |
H04L27/2647 (EP,US);
H04L25/03159 (EP,US);
H04L27/2614 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03414 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03522 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/24] |
Former [2000/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schnellstartverfahren für Mehrträgersystemen | [2000/22] | English: | Fast start-up for multicarrier systems | [2000/22] | French: | Initialisation rapide pour systèmes multiporteurs | [2000/22] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/51] | 13.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.04.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.04.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0396049 (INTELLIGENT MODEM CORP [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 2, column 1, line 38 - line 41 * * page 6, column 9, line 14 - line 21 * * figure 2 * [A] 10; | [E]US6389062 (WU SONG [US]) [E] 1-9* figure 6 *; | [E]US2002172146 (WU SONG [US], et al) [E] 1-14 * page 11, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 3 *; | [X] - KISS L ET AL, "A customizable DSP for DMT-based ADSL modem", ASIC CONFERENCE 1998, IEEE, NEW YORK, NY, USA, (19980913), ISBN 0-7803-4980-6, pages 349 - 353, XP010309657 [X] 1-9 * page 351, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 2 * * figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ASIC.1998.723033 | [XA] - SONG WU ET AL, "TI DSP implementation of a medium speed DSL (MDSL) for multimedia applications", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1998 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, IEEE, NEW YORK, NY, USA, (19980512), ISBN 0-7803-4428-6, pages 3149 - 3152, XP010279410 [X] 1-9 * figure 4 * [A] 10,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1998.678194 |