EP1003051 - Ultrasonic imaging apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE YOKOGAWA MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LTD. 7-127 Asahigaoka 4-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states GE YOKOGAWA MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LTD. 7-127 Asahigaoka 4-chome Hino-shi, Tokyo 191 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kataoka, Hiroaki 7-127, Asahigaoka 4-chome Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Yoichi 7-127, Asahigaoka 4-chome Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2000/21] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al GE LONDON PATENT OPERATION, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99309164.4 | 18.11.1999 | [2000/21] | Priority number, date | JP19980328150 | 18.11.1998 Original published format: JP 32815098 | [2000/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1003051 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1003051 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01S15/89, G01S7/52 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
A61B8/14 (KR);
G01S15/8981 (EP,US);
G01S7/5206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2003/46] |
Former [2000/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ultraschall- Bilderzeugungsgerät | [2000/21] | English: | Ultrasonic imaging apparatus | [2000/21] | French: | Appareil d'imagerie à ultrasons | [2000/21] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 29.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/30] | 14.02.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.06.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/30] | Appeal following examination | 19.04.2006 | Appeal received No. T1024/06 | 23.06.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.05.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5377684 (HARA KIYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-31 * column 1, lines 56-67; figures 1-7 * * column 3, line 7 - column 7, line 28 *; | [X]US5357580 (FORESTIERI STEVEN F [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 47 * * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 16 * * column 6, line 5 - column 9, line 52 *; | [X]US5279302 (TAMANO SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 15 * * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 30 * * column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 11 *; | [A]US5628321 (SCHEIB JOHN P [US], et al) [A] 1,4,8,9,14,15 * abstract * * column 6, line 1 - column 10, line 3 *; | [A]WO9621196 (ACUSON [US]) [A] 5,10,13,16,19 * abstract * * page 28, lines 14-26 * | [A] - R. HAERTEN/M. MÜCK-WEYMANN, Doppler- und Farbdoppler-Sonographie, ERLANGEN, SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, (1994), XP002225090 [A] 1,4,8,9,14,15 * pages 45-52 * |