EP1016989 - Extensible distributed enterprise application integration system and methods of operating same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saga Software Inc. 11190 Sunrise Valley Drive Reston, VA 20191 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states Saga Systems, Inc. 11190 Sunrise Valley Drive Reston, VA 20191 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yee, Hon-Siew 12830 Tewksbury Drive Herndon VA 20171 / US | 02 /
Gordon, Gary Alan 1524 Lincoln Way No.413 McLean, VA 22102 / US | 03 /
Taylor, John Timothy 709 Southview Place Leesburg VA 20176 / US | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99309204.8 | 18.11.1999 | [2000/27] | Priority number, date | US19980108993P | 18.11.1998 Original published format: US 108993 P | US19990412595 | 05.10.1999 Original published format: US 412595 | US19990412633 | 05.10.1999 Original published format: US 412633 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1016989 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1016989 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F9/54 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,KR);
G06F9/465 (EP);
Y02P90/80 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/27] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | System zum Integrieren von erweiterbaren verteilten Betriebsanwendungen und Verfahren zu dessen Betrieb | [2000/27] | English: | Extensible distributed enterprise application integration system and methods of operating same | [2000/27] | French: | Système pour l'intégration d'applications d'entreprise extensibles et distribuées et méthode pour son exploitation | [2000/27] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 03.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/50] | 08.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5524253 (PHAM THONG [US], et al) [A] 1-32* the whole document *; | [XA]US5627972 (SHEAR TIMOTHY A [US]) [X] 1,7,9,12,17,21,30 * the whole document * [A] 2-6,8,10,11,13-16,18-20,22-29,31,32 |